U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poyer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone or Video]
  • March 11, 2025: [Leave to Appear by Telephone or Video]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.