U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00182
  • Case Name: Barksdale v. Via Transportation Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 03, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Order to Propose Schedule]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.