U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marsh
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 19, 2025: [Discovery]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 19, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 19, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 12, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.