U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00129-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Gordon et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 03, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Withdraw as Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 25, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 14, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Discovery]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 13, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.