U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez-Gutierrez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 14, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Discovery]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 12, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 11, 2025: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.