U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00105
  • Case Name: East West Bank v. QIR Technology Holdings, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order to Propose Schedule]
  • March 19, 2025: [Civil Standing Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 12, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Appoint Receiver]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.