U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Madden et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 18, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 18, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone or Video]
  • April 16, 2025: [Leave to Appear by Telephone or Video]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.