U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00877
  • Case Name: S A International et al v. S A International Israel et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.