U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00519
  • Case Name: Taylor et al v. Salt Lake City Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Show Cause]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Short Form Discovery]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Amended Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Amended Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 18, 2025: [Short Form Discovery]
  • March 18, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.