U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00183
  • Case Name: Lamas v. Zullas
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Consolidate Cases]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order to Propose Schedule]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.