U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00505
  • Case Name: Cricut, Inc. v. Europe Warehouse GMBH & Co. KG et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 03, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 20, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 17, 2025: [Memorandum Decision]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.