U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00696
  • Case Name: BuyPD et al v. Houtz
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • April 17, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Scheduling Conference]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.