U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00601
  • Case Name: S. et al v. Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone or Video]
  • April 16, 2025: [Leave to Appear by Telephone or Video]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Amended Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 18, 2025: [Amended Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.