U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00103
  • Case Name: Newbold et al v HealthEquity Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • April 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Scheduling Conference]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • March 26, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 25, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 20, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 20, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.