U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00143
  • Case Name: Gray v. Trader Joe's
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order to Propose Schedule]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 20, 2025: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.