U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00088
  • Case Name: State of Utah et al v. Express Scripts, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Leave to File Sealed Document]
  • March 31, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 25, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.