U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00131
  • Case Name: Belvac Production Machinery v. Vobev
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2025: [Intervene]
  • March 19, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.