U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00212
  • Case Name: Woos LLC v. Mustafa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 04, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 02, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 02, 2025: [Seal]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order to Propose Schedule]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Leave to File Sealed Document - SEALED]
  • March 21, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 20, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.