U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00015-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Kuhni et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 28, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sever Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.