U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00030
  • Case Name: White v. Truist et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 23, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order to Propose Schedule]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.