U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00716
  • Case Name: Melton et al v. Renewable Innovations, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Default]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Set Aside Default]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default Certificate]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 25, 2025: [Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.