U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00235
  • Case Name: Crystal Tones, LLC v. Pyromatics Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 07, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order to Propose Schedule]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document]
  • March 25, 2025: [Leave to File Sealed Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.