U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00059-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Villagrana et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 29, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 29, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • April 29, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 02, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 01, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.