U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brewer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Review of Detention by District Judge]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 10, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.