U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-22122
  • Case Name: Lacey Janesse Mason
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [341 Notice of Meeting of Creditors for Chapter 13]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Continue/Reschedule Meeting of Creditors (order)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Trustee/USTR's Response with No Objection (NO IMAGE)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Trustee/USTR's Notice of Endorsement (NO IMAGE)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Pending Order]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Continue/Reschedule Meeting of Creditors (Motion)]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Certificate of Service Re: Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Debtor(s) Electronic Noticing Request]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Debtor's Certification of Status of Domestic Support Payments]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Declaration/Affidavit Re: Tax Returns]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [PayGov Receipt of Fee Due]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Credit Counseling Agency Briefing Certificate (Prefiling)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (FEE)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.