U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-22121
  • Case Name: Gretchen Lynn Jensen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Receipt of Installment Payment - Chapter 7 (FEE)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [341 Notice of Meeting of Creditors for Chapter 13]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [BNC Certificate of Service Re: Deficiency Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Motion)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Credit Counseling Agency Briefing Certificate (Prefiling)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (FEE)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.