U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20748
  • Case Name: Adrian Kevin Kelley and Sheila Ann Kelley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Trustee's Continuing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Pending Order]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Minute Entry - Continued By Consent]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Request]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [PayGov Receipt of Fee Due]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Trustee's Withdrawal of Document (NO IMAGE)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Declaration/Affidavit Re: Tax Returns]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Set Objection to Dismissal Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Objection to Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Notice of Preconfirmation Amended/Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Amended/Final Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Amended Schedules/List of Creditors/Statements (Dec 1 2016)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Amended Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.