U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00163-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Billings et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 01, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Discovery]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 01, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 30, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 28, 2025: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.