U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:08-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Financial Arrangements Made]
  • May 06, 2025: [Transcript Request]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notification of Transcript Fees]
  • April 28, 2025: [Transcript Request]
  • April 28, 2025: [Letter/Request]
November, 2024
  • November 28, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 05, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • October 11, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 10, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 08, 2024: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
  • March 13, 2019: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • March 03, 2019: [Reply to Response ]
  • March 01, 2019: [Addendum to PSI - First Step Act of 2018]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Response to First Step Act]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order to Respond - First Step Act]
  • February 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 13, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
  • February 08, 2019: [Addendum to PSI - First Step Act of 2018]
  • February 07, 2019: [SEALED PSR - Final]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 15, 2019: [Standing Order 2019-1 - Sec 404 First Step Act of 2018 - Appointing Federal Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.