open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia
    Case Number:6:19-cr-00004-1
    Party Name:USA v. Carranza-De La Torre
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Factual Basis]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Guilty Plea Form]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Joint Order Filed]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?114312
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =