open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00008
    Party Name:Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Equity Trustees, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Default]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certified Mail Return Receipt - U.S. Attorneys]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?114347
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =