U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hall-Andujar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [SEALED Supplemental Documents to Supervised Release Violation Report]
  • May 07, 2025: [SEALED Supervised Release Violation Report]
  • May 07, 2025: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Transferring Case to Another Judge]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • April 23, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 23, 2025: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • April 23, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 - Revocation]
  • April 22, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2025: [Arrest]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Transcript]
  • February 26, 2021: [Financial Arrangements Made]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Notification of Transcript Fees]
  • December 21, 2020: [Transcript Request]
  • December 21, 2020: [Letter]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Final Amended]
  • June 05, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 04, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 27, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • May 25, 2020: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • January 31, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 31, 2020: [Urbanski Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • January 31, 2020: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • January 30, 2020: [Factual Basis]
  • January 27, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • August 07, 2019: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • August 07, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • May 16, 2019: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • May 16, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 16, 2019: [Pretrial Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • May 15, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 07, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 07, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.