U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Canals
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 03, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • November 23, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 23, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • November 20, 2020: [Substantial Assistance]
  • November 11, 2020: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice (NextGen)]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order to Continue Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • April 03, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • March 31, 2020: [Bond]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 18, 2020: [Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • November 08, 2019: [Dillon Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 06, 2019: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • November 06, 2019: [Factual Basis]
  • November 06, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • September 24, 2019: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • September 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 04, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • September 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 28, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 28, 2019: [Superseding Indictment]
  • August 27, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • August 27, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 27, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • June 03, 2019: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Additional Evidence]
  • May 15, 2019: [Pretrial Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 14, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • May 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 13, 2019: [Information to Establish Prior Conviction]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 08, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.