U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ashby
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Letter/Request]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Status Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice (NextGen)]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Additional Evidence]
  • July 23, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • July 23, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 13, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • May 08, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Dillon Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • February 25, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 25, 2020: [Factual Basis]
  • February 25, 2020: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • November 05, 2019: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • June 12, 2019: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • June 12, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Pretrial Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • May 15, 2019: [Disclosure]
  • May 15, 2019: [Joint Order Filed]
  • May 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 15, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • May 10, 2019: [Discovery]
  • May 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 09, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.