U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v Harmon, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 15, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 07, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 03, 2021: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • September 03, 2021: [Sentencing]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Response]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Response]
  • March 11, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 21, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 03, 2020: [Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • November 23, 2020: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • November 20, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 19, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 13, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 09, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order of Detention Pending Sentencing]
  • October 13, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • October 06, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • October 06, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 01, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice (NextGen)]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 22, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 23, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 12, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Response]
  • May 13, 2020: [Response]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order to Respond]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Order to Continue Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 12, 2020: [Factual Basis]
  • February 12, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 12, 2020: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • February 12, 2020: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • February 12, 2020: [1 - Applicable Party Docket Entry & Document - use with another selection]
  • February 12, 2020: [Urbanski Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 11, 2020: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • February 11, 2020: [Factual Basis]
  • February 11, 2020: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 03, 2019: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order Fixing Trial Procedures]
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 09, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • September 09, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 02, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • August 02, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • June 09, 2019: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • June 07, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 07, 2019: [Court Hearing]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice of Enhanced Punishment]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 03, 2019: [Appearance Bond]
  • June 03, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 03, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Disclosure]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • May 31, 2019: [Joint Order Filed]
  • May 30, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Correction]
  • May 29, 2019: [Pretrial Order]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 28, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • May 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 28, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 28, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 24, 2019: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2019: [Pretrial Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • May 15, 2019: [Disclosure]
  • May 15, 2019: [Joint Order Filed]
  • May 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • May 15, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • May 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 14, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 14, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.