U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ul-Hassan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 28, 2019: [Brief /Memorandum]
  • October 23, 2019: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • October 16, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 15, 2019: [Seal Document]
  • October 10, 2019: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • October 09, 2019: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • September 24, 2019: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • August 07, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 07, 2019: [Superseding Information]
  • August 07, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 18, 2019: [Appearance Bond]
  • June 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 14, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • May 15, 2019: [Disclosure]
  • May 15, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 15, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.