U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rosa-Suarez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 06, 2025: [Seal Document]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Exhibits Destroyed]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Letter/Request]
  • June 15, 2022: [Remove Exhibits Notice]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 28, 2021: [Opinion - Jones]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Response to Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • May 03, 2021: [Notification of Transcript Fees]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Transcript Request]
  • April 26, 2021: [Dismiss]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Transcript]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 24, 2021: [Financial Arrangements Made]
  • February 24, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 18, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 18, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • February 15, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 09, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • February 01, 2021: [Transcript Request]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order Prisoner Service (2255)]
  • January 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 26, 2021: [Vacate (2255)]
  • January 05, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • January 04, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 10, 2020: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • October 22, 2020: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • October 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 20, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice (NextGen)]
  • September 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 23, 2020: [Status Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 18, 2020: [Exhibit]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • April 28, 2020: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • April 28, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 24, 2020: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • April 24, 2020: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing on Motion]
  • April 22, 2020: [Bond]
  • April 20, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • April 17, 2020: [Minute Order]
  • April 16, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • April 03, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 23, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 20, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 19, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 18, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 06, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • February 06, 2020: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • February 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • January 14, 2020: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • January 13, 2020: [Letter]
  • January 10, 2020: [Response]
  • January 08, 2020: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • January 07, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 07, 2020: [Joinder]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • January 02, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 27, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 05, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • October 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 19, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 19, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • August 19, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • August 14, 2019: [Bond]
  • August 14, 2019: [Discovery]
  • August 12, 2019: [Bond]
  • August 07, 2019: [Bond]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 01, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 01, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 23, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 17, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 17, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • July 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 16, 2019: [Discovery]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 17, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • June 14, 2019: [Disclosure]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 12, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 11, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • June 11, 2019: [Superseding Indictment]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 05, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 28, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 24, 2019: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • May 24, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 23, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 20, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 20, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • May 15, 2019: [Disclosure]
  • May 15, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 15, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.