U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Amaya-Reyes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • February 04, 2021: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • October 06, 2020: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice (NextGen)]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order to Amend/Correct]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • June 28, 2019: [Joint Order Filed]
  • June 21, 2019: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • June 19, 2019: [Appearance Bond]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 19, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 19, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 19, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 30, 2019: [Pretrial Order]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • May 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 30, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • May 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 30, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • May 24, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 23, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 23, 2019: [Superseding Indictment]
  • May 16, 2019: [Indictment]
  • May 16, 2019: [Sealed Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.