U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Estep
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 11, 2020: [Brief /Memorandum]
  • August 11, 2020: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • August 06, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • August 05, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • October 21, 2019: [Downward Departure]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 06, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Urbanski Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 21, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 21, 2019: [Factual Basis]
  • May 21, 2019: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • May 21, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 21, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • May 21, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 21, 2019: [Waiver of Rule 11 Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 21, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.