U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:19-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pena-Gallo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2020: [Waiver of Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 10, 2020: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • March 10, 2020: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • March 10, 2020: [Factual Basis]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Interpreter Appointment Scheduled]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 19, 2019: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • November 19, 2019: [Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • July 17, 2019: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2019: [Appearance Bond]
  • July 08, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • July 08, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • June 07, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 06, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 06, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 06, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 03, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.