U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Looney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 04, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 04, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • February 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Seal]
  • January 30, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • January 13, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 08, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 08, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Enhanced Punishment]
  • August 02, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • August 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 17, 2019: [Discovery]
  • June 17, 2019: [Jones Pretrial Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 17, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 17, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • May 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • May 30, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 30, 2019: [Disclosure]
  • May 30, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.