U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00023-4
  • Case Name: Sealed v Sealed
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 06, 2019: [Pretrial Order]
  • June 05, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 05, 2019: [Joint Order Filed]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 05, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 05, 2019: [Unseal Case]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Pretrial Order]
  • May 30, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 30, 2019: [Joint Order Filed]
  • May 30, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • May 30, 2019: [Appearance Bond]
  • May 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 30, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 30, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 30, 2019: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.