U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:96-cr-30013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 10, 2022: [Response]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Reply to Response]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Seal]
  • March 28, 2022: [Response]
  • March 01, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 01, 2022: [USCA Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order to Respond - First Step Act]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Assembled Supplemental Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • May 25, 2021: [USCA Notice]
  • May 24, 2021: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA]
  • May 24, 2021: [USCA Notice]
  • May 21, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Appeal to 4CCA - First Step Act]
  • May 20, 2021: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • May 19, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA]
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice of Appeal to 4CCA - First Step Act]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 29, 2021: [Seal]
  • April 29, 2021: [Response]
  • April 19, 2021: [Response]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order to Respond - First Step Act]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 01, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Reply to Response]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • September 29, 2020: [Seal]
  • September 29, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order Transferring Case to Another Judge]
  • September 14, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 11, 2020: [First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
  • September 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Judgment-Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • November 05, 2019: [Supervised Release Violation Report]
  • November 05, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 04, 2019: [Brief /Memorandum]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 18, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • June 18, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Summons-Revocation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.