U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harvey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 23, 2020: [Forfeiture of Property]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • September 17, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 15, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 03, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order to Continue Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • April 27, 2020: [Response]
  • April 23, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 23, 2020: [Order to Respond]
  • April 23, 2020: [Response]
  • April 22, 2020: [Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order to Respond]
  • April 20, 2020: [Bond]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • March 27, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • March 25, 2020: [Bond]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 02, 2020: [Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 06, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Urbanski Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • May 31, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 31, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 31, 2019: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • May 31, 2019: [Factual Basis]
  • May 31, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • May 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 31, 2019: [Waiver of Rule 11 Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 31, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.