U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Judgment-Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • January 04, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • December 29, 2021: [SEALED Supervised Release Violation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Summons-Revocation]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [ReEntry/Drug Court Proceedings]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Exhibit]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [SEALED Supervised Release Violation Report]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2021: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 29, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Summons-Revocation]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Petition to Modify Conditions or Term of Supervision]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Judgment-Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • August 20, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 12, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 - Revocation]
  • August 12, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Detention]
  • August 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • August 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 12, 2019: [Arrest]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Warrant-Revocation]
  • August 12, 2019: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Summons-Revocation]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.