U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00006-3
  • Case Name: USA v Pennington
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notification of Transcript Fees]
  • October 04, 2022: [Letter/Request]
  • October 03, 2022: [Transcript Request]
  • October 03, 2022: [Letter/Request]
  • October 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 03, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 11, 2022: [USCA 4th Circuit Memorandum]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Waiver of Hearing to Modify Conditions of Prob or SR]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Petition to Modify Conditions or Term of Supervision]
  • June 10, 2022: [Letter/Request]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 11, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [USCA Notice]
  • March 21, 2022: [USCA 4th Circuit Memorandum]
  • March 21, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • January 18, 2022: [USCA 4th Circuit Memorandum]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Response]
  • September 21, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [USCA Order]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [USCA Notice]
  • June 04, 2021: [USCA Order]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
  • April 05, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA]
  • March 23, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 03, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • February 10, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 09, 2021: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • February 05, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA]
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment to 4CCA]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 21, 2021: [First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 12, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • January 11, 2021: [Letter]
  • January 05, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • December 23, 2020: [Seal]
  • December 22, 2020: [First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 24, 2020: [Minute Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 24, 2020: [First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
  • November 04, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2020: [Sentencing]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 21, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 02, 2020: [Transcript Request]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice (NextGen)]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 21, 2020: [Notification of Transcript Fees]
  • September 21, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • September 18, 2020: [Transcript Request]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • August 24, 2020: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • August 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 24, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • August 23, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 14, 2020: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • August 14, 2020: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • August 14, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 14, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 14, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • August 12, 2020: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • August 11, 2020: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • August 07, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 06, 2020: [Appeal Transcript Filed]
  • August 06, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • August 05, 2020: [Appeal Transcript Filed]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • August 04, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • July 29, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • July 28, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 14, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 06, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Final]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [USCA Appeal Transcript Order Acknowledgment]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • June 22, 2020: [Disclosure]
  • June 18, 2020: [USCA Order Appointing Counsel in 4CCA]
  • June 13, 2020: [Appeal Transcript Filed]
  • June 12, 2020: [Appeal Transcript Filed]
  • June 03, 2020: [USCA Order Appointing Counsel in 4CCA]
  • June 03, 2020: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • June 02, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment to 4CCA]
  • June 01, 2020: [Appeal Transcript Filed]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • May 28, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 21, 2020: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • May 20, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • May 20, 2020: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • May 20, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 20, 2020: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • May 14, 2020: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • May 13, 2020: [Exhibit]
  • May 13, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • May 11, 2020: [CJA 24 Authorization Completed]
  • May 11, 2020: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • May 07, 2020: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • May 07, 2020: [USCA Appeal Transcript Order Acknowledgment]
  • May 06, 2020: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • May 01, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 01, 2020: [Appeal Transcript Filed]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Minute Order]
  • April 29, 2020: [Response]
  • April 28, 2020: [USCA Appeal Transcript Order Acknowledgment]
  • April 27, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 25, 2020: [Appeal Transcript Filed]
  • April 24, 2020: [Notice of Enhanced Punishment]
  • April 24, 2020: [Response]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • April 24, 2020: [Disclosure]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 21, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 21, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 21, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 20, 2020: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 16, 2020: [Response]
  • April 13, 2020: [Letter]
  • April 13, 2020: [Bond]
  • April 13, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 08, 2020: [Appeal Transcript Filed]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Appeal Transcript Filed]
  • March 25, 2020: [USCA Appeal Transcript Order Acknowledgment]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 13, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 12, 2020: [USCA Order Appointing Counsel in 4CCA]
  • March 12, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • March 11, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • March 11, 2020: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • March 11, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 11, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • March 10, 2020: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • March 10, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 10, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [USCA Order Appointing Counsel in 4CCA]
  • March 10, 2020: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • March 09, 2020: [USCA Appeal Transcript Order Acknowledgment]
  • March 09, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 09, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • March 09, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA]
  • March 06, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment to 4CCA]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Sentence]
  • March 05, 2020: [USCA Appeal Transcript Order Acknowledgment]
  • March 03, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • March 03, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • March 03, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Transcript]
  • March 02, 2020: [Financial Arrangements Made]
  • March 02, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Correction]
  • March 02, 2020: [USCA Order Appointing Counsel in 4CCA]
  • March 02, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Transcript Request]
  • February 28, 2020: [Modify Sentence]
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • February 28, 2020: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • February 28, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 28, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 28, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • February 28, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • February 28, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • February 27, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA]
  • February 27, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment to 4CCA]
  • February 27, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • February 27, 2020: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • February 27, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • February 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 26, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • February 25, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • February 25, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 24, 2020: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • February 24, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • February 24, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 21, 2020: [Brief /Memorandum]
  • February 21, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • February 21, 2020: [Appeal Transcript Filed]
  • February 20, 2020: [Reduce Sentence]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 20, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • February 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 18, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • February 18, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Exculpatory Evidence]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Release of Jencks]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • February 17, 2020: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Release of Jencks]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Exculpatory Evidence]
  • February 14, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • February 14, 2020: [Disclosure]
  • February 14, 2020: [Discovery]
  • February 14, 2020: [Exculpatory Evidence]
  • February 14, 2020: [Early Release of Jencks]
  • February 12, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 12, 2020: [USCA Appeal Transcript Order Acknowledgment]
  • February 11, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • February 11, 2020: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • February 11, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 11, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • February 10, 2020: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • February 10, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 07, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 07, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • February 07, 2020: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • February 07, 2020: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • February 07, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 07, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • February 06, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 04, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • February 04, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 04, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • January 29, 2020: [Abstract Issued]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • January 29, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 28, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 28, 2020: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • January 28, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • January 28, 2020: [USCA Order Appointing Counsel in 4CCA]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 27, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • January 27, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 24, 2020: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • January 23, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • January 23, 2020: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • January 23, 2020: [Minute Order]
  • January 22, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 22, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA]
  • January 22, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment to 4CCA]
  • January 22, 2020: [Seal Document]
  • January 21, 2020: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • January 21, 2020: [Objections]
  • January 21, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 21, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • January 17, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • January 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 16, 2020: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • January 16, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 15, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • January 14, 2020: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • January 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 14, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 13, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 13, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • January 10, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 10, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • January 09, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • January 09, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • January 08, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • January 07, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • January 07, 2020: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • January 07, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 07, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 03, 2020: [Letter]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • January 02, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • January 02, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 02, 2020: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • January 02, 2020: [Letter]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 24, 2019: [Minute Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 23, 2019: [Acquittal]
  • December 20, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • December 19, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Substantial Assistance]
  • December 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 17, 2019: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 17, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 13, 2019: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • December 13, 2019: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • December 12, 2019: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • December 12, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 11, 2019: [Substantial Assistance]
  • December 11, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • December 10, 2019: [Return of Exhibits]
  • December 10, 2019: [Jury Verdict]
  • December 10, 2019: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • December 10, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 10, 2019: [Jury Instructions ]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 10, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • December 10, 2019: [Acquittal]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 10, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 10, 2019: [Jury Trial]
  • December 10, 2019: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • December 09, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Executed]
  • December 09, 2019: [Letter]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • December 05, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • December 05, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • December 05, 2019: [Return of Exhibits]
  • December 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 04, 2019: [Jury Trial]
  • December 04, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • December 03, 2019: [Warrant]
  • December 03, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • December 03, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 03, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 03, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 03, 2019: [Jury Trial]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Pretrial Order]
  • November 27, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • November 27, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 27, 2019: [Seal Document]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 27, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 27, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 27, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 26, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 26, 2019: [Discovery]
  • November 25, 2019: [Suppress]
  • November 25, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 24, 2019: [Strike]
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 19, 2019: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • November 18, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 18, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • November 15, 2019: [Response]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 15, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • November 14, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 14, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 14, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 14, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • November 14, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 12, 2019: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Speedy Trial]
  • November 11, 2019: [Discovery]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2019: [Transcript]
  • November 08, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • November 08, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 08, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 07, 2019: [Discovery]
  • November 07, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 07, 2019: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • November 06, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • November 06, 2019: [Consent to Allow United States Magistrate Judge to Accept Plea]
  • November 06, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • November 06, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 05, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • November 05, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 04, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 04, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • November 04, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Enhanced Punishment]
  • November 01, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • November 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 01, 2019: [Consent to Allow United States Magistrate Judge to Accept Plea]
  • November 01, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 30, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 29, 2019: [Response]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • October 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 28, 2019: [Psychiatric Report]
  • October 25, 2019: [Response]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of Enhanced Punishment]
  • October 24, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order]
  • October 23, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 22, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 21, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • October 16, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • October 16, 2019: [Consent to Allow United States Magistrate Judge to Accept Plea]
  • October 16, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 09, 2019: [Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • October 08, 2019: [Consent to Allow United States Magistrate Judge to Accept Plea]
  • October 08, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • October 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 07, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 04, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 02, 2019: [Notice of Enhanced Punishment]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Enhanced Punishment]
  • October 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 29, 2019: [Transcript]
  • September 29, 2019: [Financial Arrangements Made]
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • September 24, 2019: [Order]
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of Enhanced Punishment]
  • September 24, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 17, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • September 17, 2019: [Consent to Allow United States Magistrate Judge to Accept Plea]
  • September 17, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • September 17, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • September 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 13, 2019: [Letter]
  • September 13, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • September 12, 2019: [Transcript Request]
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 04, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • September 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Letter]
  • August 27, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 27, 2019: [Response]
  • August 27, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate - SEALED]
  • August 27, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 26, 2019: [Response]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 23, 2019: [Joinder]
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 23, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 23, 2019: [Court Hearing]
  • August 23, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 23, 2019: [Response]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 21, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 21, 2019: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 21, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • August 21, 2019: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • August 21, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 21, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 20, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • August 20, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 20, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 19, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 19, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 19, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond Forfeiture]
  • August 15, 2019: [Bond Forfeiture]
  • August 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 14, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order to Respond]
  • August 13, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • August 13, 2019: [Joinder]
  • August 13, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • August 09, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 09, 2019: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order for Bond Forfeiture]
  • August 07, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • August 07, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order to Respond]
  • August 01, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • July 31, 2019: [Order for Bond Forfeiture]
  • July 31, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 - Revocation]
  • July 31, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 31, 2019: [Jones Pretrial Order]
  • July 31, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • July 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 30, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • July 30, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • July 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 - Revocation]
  • July 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 30, 2019: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Warrant-Revocation]
  • July 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 24, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 23, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 23, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 18, 2019: [Discovery]
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • July 16, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 16, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 16, 2019: [Detention]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • July 16, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • July 16, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 16, 2019: [Discovery]
  • July 15, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 15, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 12, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 03, 2019: [Appearance Bond]
  • July 03, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 03, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • July 03, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 27, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 27, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 19, 2019: [Discovery]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 19, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • June 18, 2019: [Disclosure]
  • June 18, 2019: [Discovery]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 18, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 18, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 17, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 17, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 17, 2019: [Discovery]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 14, 2019: [Discovery]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 12, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 12, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 12, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 12, 2019: [Discovery]
  • June 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 12, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 11, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 11, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 11, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 11, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 11, 2019: [Detention]
  • June 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 10, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 10, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 10, 2019: [Discovery]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 10, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 07, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 07, 2019: [Discovery]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 06, 2019: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 06, 2019: [Discovery]
  • June 06, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 06, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 05, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 05, 2019: [Discovery]
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 05, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 05, 2019: [Appearance Bond]
  • June 05, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 05, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 05, 2019: [Detention]
  • June 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • June 04, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.