U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cortez-Ruiz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 16, 2019: [Waiver of Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 16, 2019: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • August 16, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order Transferring Case to Another Judge]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 02, 2019: [Joint Order Filed]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • June 07, 2019: [Pretrial Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • June 07, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 06, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 06, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • June 06, 2019: [Indictment]
  • June 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 06, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 05, 2019: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 05, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.