U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez-Vicente
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 15, 2019: [Waiver of Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 15, 2019: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • August 15, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order Transferring Case to Another Judge]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Joint Order Filed]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 11, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • June 07, 2019: [Pretrial Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • June 07, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 06, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 06, 2019: [Indictment]
  • June 06, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • June 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 05, 2019: [Complaint]
  • June 05, 2019: [Warrant Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.