U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:04-cr-30042-1
  • Case Name: USA v Jeffers et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Transfer Out Supervised Releasee/Probationer]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Transcript]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Financial Arrangements Made]
  • June 26, 2019: [Transcript Request]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
  • June 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 18, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 08, 2019: [Response in Support]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.