open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00034
    Party Name:United States for the use and benefit of S.L. Williamson Company, Inc. et al v. Aegis Security Insurance Company
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Default]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Briefing Order]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Summons]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?115677
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =